x Turn on thread page Beta
 You are Here: Home >< Maths

# Express in terms of powers of prime numbers watch

1. Hi I'm a mech. eng undergraduate, and i have an exam next week so im powering through the past papers

ive come across this question

46 x 93 / 54 x 83 x 32

it says express it in terms of powers of prime numbers

now first of all can someone explain to me what that means? My lecturers are completely useless as frankly they do not give a f and ive been sitting here trying to figure this one out.

i understand you have to make the bases the same in order to get anywhere, but HOW

im completely stumped

i would appreciate a prod in the right direction

2. (Original post by n0cturnal)
Hi I'm a mech. eng undergraduate, and i have an exam next week so im powering through the past papers

ive come across this question

46 x 93 / 54 x 83 x 32

it says express it in terms of powers of prime numbers

now first of all can someone explain to me what that means? My lecturers are completely useless as frankly they do not give a f and ive been sitting here trying to figure this one out.

i understand you have to make the bases the same in order to get anywhere, but HOW

im completely stumped

i would appreciate a prod in the right direction

4^6 = (2^2)^6 = 2^12 where 2 is a prime

9^3 = (3^2)^3 = 3^6 where 3 is prime

Do this for all the numbers, cancel out common factors and you'll have a product of powers of primes.
3. cheers man! looks like i wasted a few hours over nothing!
4. (Original post by n0cturnal)
cheers man! looks like i wasted a few hours over nothing!
Ah, that's annoying! Glad it's sorted now.
5. i sent you a pm but im going to post this here again for anybody elses benefit who may be struggling

ive got another question...

64 x 55 / 65 x 63

im trying to write out each individual number so

64 would equal 22 x 32 am i correct?

following that logic im getting 22 x 32 x 55 / 23 x 32 x 23 x 30

but my final answer is still wrong

the thing is i wouldnt know if my answer was wrong or right if i didnt have the answer sheet and im confused af right now
6. need to post this excellent reply here just in case somebody else may be struggling

(Original post by Zacken)
Remember, you can always check your logic with a calculator! 6 = 2 * 3So 6^4 = (2 * 3)^4 = 2^4 * 3^4This works if you enter 2^4 * 3^4 in your calculator, then clear. Then 6^4 and see if you get the same answer. Can you work out the rest of the question correctly now? Use the rule that
7. (Original post by n0cturnal)
i sent you a pm but im going to post this here again for anybody elses benefit who may be struggling

ive got another question...

64 x 55 / 65 x 63

im trying to write out each individual number so

64 would equal 22 x 32 am i correct?

following that logic im getting 22 x 32 x 55 / 23 x 32 x 23 x 30

but my final answer is still wrong

the thing is i wouldnt know if my answer was wrong or right if i didnt have the answer sheet and im confused af right now
64=32x2=2^6 try do this method for the other numbers.
Then use indices rules and cancle.

Posted from TSR Mobile

TSR Support Team

We have a brilliant team of more than 60 Support Team members looking after discussions on The Student Room, helping to make it a fun, safe and useful place to hang out.

This forum is supported by:
Updated: January 18, 2016
Today on TSR

### Four things top students are doing

Over the Easter break

Poll
Useful resources

### Maths Forum posting guidelines

Not sure where to post? Read the updated guidelines here

### How to use LaTex

Writing equations the easy way

### Study habits of A* students

Top tips from students who have already aced their exams